EP0112517 - Polyether compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/27] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foley, Louise H. 30 Park Court Durham, New Hampshire / US | 02 /
Westley, John 91 South Mountain Avenue Cedar Grove, New Jersey / US | 03 /
Sello, Lilian H. 43 Reservoir Place Cedar Grove, New Jersey / US | [1984/27] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/27] | Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111971.4 | 29.11.1983 | [1984/27] | Priority number, date | US19820444958 | 29.11.1982 Original published format: US 444958 | US19830530187 | 24.10.1983 Original published format: US 530187 | [1984/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0112517 | Date: | 04.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0112517 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/00, A61K31/70, A23K1/16 | [1984/27] | CPC: |
C07H19/01 (EP,US);
A23K20/195 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/27] | Title | German: | Polyätherverbindungen | [1984/27] | English: | Polyether compounds | [1984/27] | French: | Polyéthers | [1984/27] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/27] | 26.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.11.1986 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0035119 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) |