EP0113432 - Chloromethyl quinoline derivatives, process for their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1994 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALKALOIDA VEGYéSZETI GYáR Postfach 1 H-4440 Tiszavasvári / HU | [1984/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salamon, Zoltán, Dipl.-Chem. Elmunkas u.11. Tiszavasvári / HU | 02 /
Imre geb. Virág, Ilona Kabay J. u.25 Tiszavasvári / HU | 03 /
Sebestyén, Magdolna Irányi u. 16.E. Hajdunánás / HU | [1984/29] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/29] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83112147.0 | 02.12.1983 | [1984/29] | Priority number, date | HU19820003869 | 02.12.1982 Original published format: HU 386982 | [1984/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0113432 | Date: | 18.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0113432 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/18, C07D215/20, C07D215/26, C07D215/25, A61K31/47 | [1984/29] | CPC: |
C07D215/20 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
C07D215/18 (EP,US);
C07D215/26 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL [1984/29] | Title | German: | Neue Chlormethylchinolin-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1984/29] | English: | Chloromethyl quinoline derivatives, process for their preparation and their use | [1984/29] | French: | Dérivés de chlorométhylquinoléine, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1984/29] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 18.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/15] | 24.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 27.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 07.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2166196 (RIKER LABORATORIES INC); | [X]DE2458146 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE); | [X]EP0049776 (BASF AG [DE]) | [XD] - JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, Band 2, Nr. 2, Juni 1965 | [X] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, Band 11, Nr. 2, 26. Februar 1968, The American Chemical Society | [AD] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, Band 14, Nr. 12, Dezember 1971, | Examination | EP0111329 | - JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, Band 2, Nr. 2, Juni 1965 ADRIENNE STEINACKER DEY et al.: "Synthesis and Properties of Fluorine-Containing Heterocyclic Compounds. I. Trifluoromethyl Quinolines (I)", Seiten 113-119 | - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, Band 11, Nr. 2, 26. Februar 1968, The American Chemical Society W.P. PURCELL et al.: "Application of regression analyses to antitumor activitiesof various acetylenic carbamates", Seiten 267-269. | - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, Band 14, Nr. 12, Dezember 1971, J.C.CRAIG et al.: "Potential Antimalarials".7. Tribromomethylquinolines and positive halogen compounds", Seiten 1221-1222 | - Methoden der Organischen Chemie (Houben-Weyl), Band V/3 Halogenverbindungen, Georg Thieme Verlag, Stuttgart 1962 (4. Auflage) |