EP0113081 - Laminar structure of polyester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.1987 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1984/28] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Molari, Richard Edgar, Jr. 365 Churchill Street Pittsfield Massachusetts 01201 / US | [1984/28] | Representative(s) | Catherine, Alain, et al General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18, rue Horace Vernet 92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [2008/43] |
Former [1985/05] | Catherine, Alain, et al General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1984/28] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 83112395.5 | 09.12.1983 | [1984/28] | Priority number, date | US19820453558 | 27.12.1982 Original published format: US 453558 | [1984/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0113081 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0113081 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/36, G09F13/16 | [1985/23] | CPC: |
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/20 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
G02B5/128 (EP,US);
B32B2305/08 (US);
B32B2307/41 (US);
B32B2307/416 (US);
B32B2590/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [1984/28] | B32B27/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/28] | Title | German: | Schichtenstruktur aus Polyester | [1984/28] | English: | Laminar structure of polyester | [1984/28] | French: | Structure laminaire en polyester | [1984/28] | File destroyed: | 30.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 15.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/12] | 17.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/44] | 29.05.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1987 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3510976 (PAULINE RONALD F, et al); | [A]DE2343870 (BASF AG); | [A]US4117616 (PENTON HUGH V); | [AD]US4226658 (CARLSON RUSSELL L, et al); | [AD]US4257937 (COHEN STUART C, et al); | [AP]DE3208914 (WOLF GMBH [DE]) |