EP0111334 - Article for use in automatically and continuously making stuffed casing products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/25] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raudys, Vytas Andrew 5545 S. Rutherford Avenue Chicago Ill. 60638 / US | [1984/25] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/25] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83112428.4 | 09.12.1983 | [1984/25] | Priority number, date | US19820448349 | 09.12.1982 Original published format: US 448349 | [1984/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0111334 | Date: | 20.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A22C11/02 | [1984/25] | CPC: |
A22C11/0281 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/25] | Title | German: | Artikel zur automatischen und kontinuierlichen Füllung von umhüllten Produkten | [1984/25] | English: | Article for use in automatically and continuously making stuffed casing products | [1984/25] | French: | Article pour le bourrage automatique et continu des produits enveloppés | [1984/25] | File destroyed: | 08.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 29.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/36] | 03.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3462793 (SUMPTION RICHARD F); | [AD]US3777331 (FALBORG H); | [A]FR2419454 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [AP]EP0091081 (KOLLROSS GUENTER); | [A]DE2511770 (KUESTERMANN & CO) |