EP0114322 - Method and arrangement for converting a two-level binary signal into a pulse-coded signal presenting data pulses and refreshing pulses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.08.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Görne, Jan, Dipl.-Ing. Heinrich-Vogl-Strasse 8 D-8000 München 71 / DE | 02 /
Toussaint, Hans-Norbert, Dr. Ing. Karlsbergstrasse 41 D-8000 München 71 / DE | [1984/31] | Application number, filing date | 83112711.3 | 16.12.1983 | [1984/31] | Priority number, date | DE19823247120 | 20.12.1982 Original published format: DE 3247120 | [1984/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0114322 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0114322 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/32, H04B9/00 | [1984/31] | CPC: |
H04L25/49 (EP,US);
H04B10/502 (EP,US);
H04B10/524 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Schaltungsanordnung zur Umsetzung eines zwischen zwei Pegeln wechselnden Binärsignals in ein Pulscodesignal, das Datenimpulse und Erneuerungsimpulse aufweist | [1984/31] | English: | Method and arrangement for converting a two-level binary signal into a pulse-coded signal presenting data pulses and refreshing pulses | [1984/31] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la conversion d'un signal binaire à deux niveaux en un signal à impulsions codées qui présente des impulsions de données et des impulsions de rafraîchissement | [1984/31] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 13.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 24.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.04.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1989/38] | 23.06.1989 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1989 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1394485 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO); | [YD]DE2648940 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO); | [A]US4347617 (MURANO KAZUO, et al) | [Y] - GLOBECOM '82, Miami, 29. November - 2. Dezember 1982, Band 1, Seiten B5.6.1-B5.6.5, IEEE, New York, US; Y. MOCHIDA et al.: "Hardware design concepts of LSI optical data link" |