EP0114327 - Play-free ball-joint, in particular for test-equipment and joint assembly comprising such ball-joints [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/31] | Play-free ball-joint, in particular for test-equipment and articulated assembly comprising such ball-joints | ||
[1987/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.1988 [1988/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARL SCHENCK AG 64273 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states CARL SCHENCK AG D-64273 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Godau, Siegfried Georg-Büchner-Strasse 22 D-6103 Griesheim / DE | 02 /
Sandner, Rudolf Falltorstrasse 37a D-6081 Biebesheim / DE | 03 /
Keller, Günter Am Felsenkeller 47 D-6101 Modautal 1 / DE | 04 /
Hintz, Gerhard Holzgasse 44 D-6101 Rossdorf / DE | 05 /
Pohl, Andreas Am Herrenhof 9 D-6102 Pfungstadt / DE | 06 /
Zuber, Günter Berliner Strasse 16 D-6101 Messel / DE | [1984/31] | Representative(s) | Brand, Fritz Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung Landwehrstrasse 55 Postfach 4018 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Brand, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung Landwehrstrasse 55 Postfach 4018 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 83112734.5 | 17.12.1983 | [1984/31] | Priority number, date | DE19833301543 | 19.01.1983 Original published format: DE 3301543 | DE19833310064 | 19.03.1983 Original published format: DE 3310064 | [1984/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0114327 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0114327 | Date: | 16.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0114327 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16C11/06, G01M13/02 | [1984/31] | CPC: |
F16C11/0633 (EP);
F16C11/0647 (EP);
F16C11/106 (EP);
G01M13/027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1984/31] | Title | German: | Spielfreies Kugelgelenk, insbesondere für Prüfeinrichtungen, und Gelenkanordnung mit solchen Kugelgelenken | [1984/31] | English: | Play-free ball-joint, in particular for test-equipment and joint assembly comprising such ball-joints | [1987/12] | French: | Rotule sans jeu, en particulier pour dispositifs d'essai et ensemble rotule comportant de telles rotules | [1987/12] |
Former [1984/31] | Play-free ball-joint, in particular for test-equipment and articulated assembly comprising such ball-joints | ||
Former [1984/31] | Rotule sans jeu, en particulier pour dispositifs d'essai et ensemble articulé comportant de telles rotules | Examination procedure | 15.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/35] | 12.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2074337 (UNIV TECHNOLOGY); | [A]FR1369413 (CITROEN SA ANDRE); | [A]US3744859 (RINGEL R); | [A]FR2505952 (CITROEN SA [FR]) |