EP0115611 - Printing device with additional electrostatic field [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1988 [1988/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spengler, Walter Strehlgasse 23 CH-4105 Biel-Benken / CH | [1984/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/33] | Representative(s) | Gehrig, Peter, et al A. Braun, Braun, Héritier, Eschmann AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/33] | Gehrig, Peter, et al A. Braun, Braun, Héritier, Eschmann AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 CH-4051 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 83112743.6 | 17.12.1983 | [1984/33] | Priority number, date | CH19820007566 | 27.12.1982 Original published format: CH 756682 | [1984/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0115611 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0115611 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B41F9/06 | [1984/33] | CPC: |
B41F9/001 (EP,US);
B41F13/18 (EP,US);
Y10S101/37 (EP,US);
Y10S430/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/33] | Title | German: | Druckwerk mit elektrostatischer Druckhilfe | [1984/33] | English: | Printing device with additional electrostatic field | [1984/33] | French: | Dispositif à imprimer avec un champ électrostatique auxiliaire | [1984/33] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/13] | 14.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2212951 (POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG); | [A]DE2713334 (KNOPF FRANZ) |