EP0146650 - Magazine for replaceable tools and operation method of indexing tools using the magazine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Niigata Engineering Co., Ltd. No. 4-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/27] | For all designated states Niigata Engineering Co., Ltd. No. 4-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasukawa, Hiroshi No. 66 Kamikido Niigata-shi, Niigata / JP | [1985/27] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/27] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83112990.3 | 22.12.1983 | [1985/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0146650 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0146650 | Date: | 01.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0146650 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q3/155 | [1985/27] | CPC: |
B23Q3/15526 (EP,US);
B23Q2003/15527 (EP,US);
Y10T483/179 (EP,US);
Y10T483/1809 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1985/27] | Title | German: | Magazin für auswechselbare Werkzeuge und Verfahren zum Positionieren von Werkzeugen mit dem Magazin | [1985/27] | English: | Magazine for replaceable tools and operation method of indexing tools using the magazine | [1985/27] | French: | Magasin pour outils remplaçables et procédé pour positionner des outils au moyen du magasin | [1985/27] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 02.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57121436 ; | [A]JP58126033 ; | [A]FR1487296 (SAALFELD WERKZEUGMASCHINEN); | [A]US3355798 (DRECHSLER ERICH F); | [A]US3524248 (DURR ALFRED W, et al); | [A]GB1408131 (GLACIER METAL CO LTD); | [A]US4402125 (CARROLL RICHARD R [US], et al) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 216 (M-168)[1094], 29th October 1982; & JP - A - 57 121 436 (KURASHIKI KIKAI K.K.) 28-07-1982, & JP57121436 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 237 (M-250)[1382], 21st October 1983; & JP - A - 58 126 033 (SANWA SEIKI K.K.) 27-07-1983, & JP58126033 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0088131 |