EP0114389 - Substituted arylglyoxal derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Floyd, Middleton Brawner, Jr. 5 Babbling Brook Road Suffern New York 10901 / US | 02 /
DeVries, Vern Gordon 425 Farview Street Ridgewood New Jersey 07450 / US | [1984/31] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83113028.1 | 23.12.1983 | [1984/31] | Priority number, date | US19830459449 | 20.01.1983 Original published format: US 459449 | US19830459450 | 20.01.1983 Original published format: US 459450 | US19830461337 | 27.01.1983 Original published format: US 461337 | [1984/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0114389 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0114389 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07C49/82, C07C49/84, C07C49/86, C07C45/28, C07C45/30, C07C45/64, C07C143/00, C07C97/10, C07C101/60 | [1984/31] | CPC: |
C07C323/66 (EP);
C07C205/45 (EP);
C07C221/00 (EP);
C07C225/22 (EP);
C07C227/18 (EP);
C07C229/60 (EP);
C07C309/24 (EP);
C07C323/20 (EP);
C07C323/22 (EP);
C07C45/28 (EP);
C07C45/30 (EP);
C07C45/54 (EP);
C07C45/64 (EP);
C07C45/71 (EP);
C07C49/82 (EP);
C07C49/84 (EP);
C07C49/86 (EP);
C07C2601/04 (EP);
C07C2601/14 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C221/00, C07C225/22 (EP);
C07C227/18, C07C229/60 (EP);
C07C45/28, C07C49/86 (EP);
C07C45/30, C07C49/84 (EP);
C07C45/30, C07C49/86 (EP);
C07C45/54, C07C49/86 (EP);
C07C45/64, C07C49/82 (EP);
C07C45/64, C07C49/84 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/31] | Title | German: | Substituierte Arylglyoxal-Derivate | [1984/31] | English: | Substituted arylglyoxal derivatives | [1984/31] | French: | Dérivés d'arylglyoxal substitués | [1984/31] | File destroyed: | 03.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 15.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/29] | 11.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/45] | 22.05.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YP]EP0089894 ; | [X]DE1966002 ; | [Y]GB897303 ; | [Y]FR1305363 ; | [X]GB919196 |