EP0125346 - Improved catalyst blend containing 1,2-dimethylimidazole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1988 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. P.O. Box 538 Allentown, Pennsylvania 18105 / US | [1986/36] |
Former [1984/47] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 14th Street and Sheridan Road North St North Chicago, Illinois 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casati, François Marie 1685 Elmwood Drive Highland Park IL 60035 / US | 02 /
Penaloza, Hernan Raul 1228 Elmwood Avenue Palatine IL 60067 / US | 03 /
Arbir, Francis Walter 5 N 353 Neva Terrace Itasca IL 60143 / US | [1984/47] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 83113102.4 | 24.12.1983 | [1984/47] | Priority number, date | US19830494198 | 13.05.1983 Original published format: US 494198 | [1984/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0125346 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0125346 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/18, C08G18/20, C08G18/14 | [1984/47] | CPC: |
C08G18/20 (EP,US);
C08G18/1808 (EP,US);
C08G18/2063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/47] | Title | German: | 1,2 Dimethylimidazol enthaltendes Katalysatorgemisch | [1984/47] | English: | Improved catalyst blend containing 1,2-dimethylimidazole | [1984/47] | French: | Mélange de catalyseurs contenant du 1,2 diméthylimidazole | [1984/47] | Examination procedure | 14.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/30] | 16.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.12.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1450187 (BASF AG); | [A]US3769244 (HASHIMOTO S, et al); | [A]US4255528 (RADEN DANIEL S, et al) |