EP0120138 - Ridge covering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.1987 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Hans Klöber Scharpenberger Strasse 72-74 D-5828 Ennepetal / DE | [1984/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holtgrewe, Johannes Beyenburger Strasse 20 D-5830 Schwelm / DE | [1984/40] | Representative(s) | Rieder, Hans-Joachim Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Postfach 11 04 51 42304 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/28] | Rieder, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Postfach 11 04 51 D-42304 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1984/40] | Rieder, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Postfach 11 04 51 D-42304 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 83113108.1 | 24.12.1983 | [1984/40] | Priority number, date | DE19833310861 | 25.03.1983 Original published format: DE 3310861 | [1984/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0120138 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0120138 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | E04D3/40, E04D13/16 | [1984/40] | CPC: |
E04D13/174 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/40] | Title | German: | Dachfirstabdeckung | [1984/40] | English: | Ridge covering | [1984/40] | French: | Couverture faîtière | [1984/40] | File destroyed: | 03.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 02.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/07] | 10.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 31.12.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2399515 ; | [A]DE2258811 ; | [AP]DE3313875 |