EP0130240 - Circuit arrangement for transmitting analogous low-frequency signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.1986 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HI-WORK SA Hauptstrasse 34 CH-8750 Glarus / CH | [1985/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rottmann, Maximilian R. Stationsstrasse 5 CH-8623 Wetzikon / CH | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Rottmann, Maximilian Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Gartenstrasse 28 A 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Rottmann, Maximilian Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37 8052 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1986/18] | Rottmann, Maximilian R. c/o Rottmann + Quehl AG Glattalstrasse 37 CH-8052 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1985/02] | Rottmann, Maximilian R. Hug Interlizenz AG Alte Zürcherstrasse 49 CH-8903 Birmensdorf/ZH / CH | Application number, filing date | 83113232.9 | 30.12.1983 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | CH19830003659 | 04.07.1983 Original published format: CH 365983 | [1985/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0130240 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0130240 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/54 | [1985/02] | CPC: |
H04B3/54 (EP);
H04B2203/5416 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/02] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Übertragung von analogen Niederfrequenzsignalen | [1985/02] | English: | Circuit arrangement for transmitting analogous low-frequency signals | [1985/02] | French: | Montage pour transmission de signaux analogues à basse fréquence | [1985/02] | File destroyed: | 08.12.1992 | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/03] | 01.07.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/02] | 04.08.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1987/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3909618 ; | [A]DE2508449 ; | [A]US3369078 | [A] - BBC-NACHRICHTEN, Heft 11, 1978, Seiten 503-506, Mannheim, DE; R. ZAPP: "Wechselsprechanlage Busch Infoton im Installationssystem" |