EP0084399 - Self-aligned oxide isolated process and device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.1990 [1990/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1983/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mastroianni, Sal 2929 S. Estrella Circle Mesa Arizona / US | 02 /
Krolikowski, Walter F. 11244 N. St. Andrews Way Scottsdale Arizona / US | [1983/30] | Representative(s) | Ibbotson, Harold Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/30] | Ibbotson, Harold Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 83200057.4 | 14.01.1983 | [1983/30] | Priority number, date | US19820339954 | 18.01.1982 Original published format: US 339954 | [1983/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0084399 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0084399 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084399 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/76, H01L21/31 | [1983/30] | CPC: |
H01L21/31111 (EP,US);
H01L21/76205 (EP,US);
H01L21/76216 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1983/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur selbstalignierten Oxydisolation und Anordnung | [1983/30] | English: | Self-aligned oxide isolated process and device | [1983/30] | French: | Procédé d'isolation d'oxyde auto-alignée et dispositif | [1983/30] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/48] | 12.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0000327 (IBM [US]); | [A]FR2358748 (RADIOTECHNIQUE COMPELEC [FR]); | [A]US3648125 (PELTZER DOUGLAS L) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 25, no. 3B, August 1982, pages 1457-1459, New York, US; C.G.JAMBOTKAR: "Emitter butting against recessed oxide isolation" |