EP0086023 - Pivoting gauze screen door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 01.11.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bruynzeel Plastics B.V. Nijverheidsweg 27 Postbus 70 NL-3340 AB Hendrik Ido Ambacht (Z.H.) / NL | [1990/52] |
Former [1983/33] | For all designated states van Wesenbeeck, Cornelis Maria 4, Kapelstraat NL-4726 AM Heerle Gem.Wouw / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Wesenbeeck, Cornelis Maria 4, Kapelstraat NL-4726 AM Heerle Gem. Wouw / NL | [1991/51] |
Former [1983/33] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Siemens, André M.E. SIEMENS & CIE. Roskam 8 4813 GZ Breda / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/33] | Siemens, Andreas Meinhard Ernest, Dipl.-Ing. SIEMENS & CIE. Roskam 8 NL-4813 GZ Breda / NL | Application number, filing date | 83200171.3 | 01.02.1983 | [1983/33] | Priority number, date | NL19820000456 | 05.02.1982 Original published format: NL 8200456 | [1983/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0086023 | Date: | 17.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0086023 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/35] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0086023 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/54 | [1983/33] | CPC: |
E06B9/54 (EP);
E06B2009/543 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, SE [1983/33] | Title | German: | Insektenschutzrolläden für Türen | [1986/35] | English: | Pivoting gauze screen door | [1983/33] | French: | Moustiquaire pivotant pour portes | [1983/33] |
Former [1983/33] | Insektenschutzrolladen für Türen | Examination procedure | 23.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/15] | 29.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.1987
05.03.1987
ADMISSIBLE Hamstra Weesp B.V. Stationsweg 28 Postbus 1 NL-1380 AA Weesp / NL Opponent's representative Kupecz, Arpad Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | 02
27.05.1987
16.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Bruynzeel Plastics B.V. Nijverheidsweg 27 P.O. Box 70 NL-3340 AB Hendrik Ido Ambacht / NL Opponent's representative Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al, et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.1987
05.03.1987
ADMISSIBLE Hamstra Weesp B.V. Stationsweg 28 Postbus 1 NL-1380 AA Weesp / NL Opponent's representative Kupecz, Arpad Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Postbox 20052 NL-1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | ||
02
27.05.1987
16.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Bruynzeel Plastics B.V. Nijverheidsweg 27 P.O. Box 70 NL-3340 AB Hendrik Ido Ambacht / NL Opponent's representative Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al, et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | |||
Former [1987/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.1987
05.03.1987
ADMISSIBLE Hamstra Weesp B.V. Stationsweg 28 Postbus 1 NL-1380 AA Weesp / NL Opponent's representative Kupecz, Arpad Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Postbox 20052 NL-1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | 24.08.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.02.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.03.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 31.01.1989 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.02.1989 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.02.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.06.1991 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.06.1991 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.09.1991 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 16.03.1989 | Appeal received No. T0231/89 | 14.03.1989 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.11.1990 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1990/47] | 09.01.1991 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1991/02] | 14.06.1991 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB388138 (LESLIE CHARLES JOHNSTON); | [X]US2540270 (AGNES LUBER MARY); | [X]NL7614313 (BEHROUZ HADJI DJAWADI T HAF 39) |