EP0113929 - Merchandise display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.1986 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.1986 [1986/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Field, Frank P. 854 Napoli Drive Pacific Palisades California / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/30] | For all designated states Field, Frank P. 854 Napoli Drive Pacific Palisades California / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/30] | Representative(s) | de Boer, Hindrik Geert Jan de Boer & Wigman P.O. Box 5265 De Lairessestraat 131-135 NL-1007 AG Amsterdam / NL | [1984/30] | Application number, filing date | 83200446.9 | 30.03.1983 | [1984/30] | Priority number, date | US19820451004 | 20.12.1982 Original published format: US 451004 | [1984/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0113929 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A47F1/12 | [1984/30] | CPC: |
A47F1/126 (EP);
B65D25/101 (EP);
B65D5/724 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/30] | Title | German: | Auslagevorrichtung für Waren | [1984/30] | English: | Merchandise display device | [1984/30] | French: | Dispositif pour la présentation de marchandises | [1984/30] | File destroyed: | 08.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 27.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/44] | 03.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/15] | 13.11.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1207058 (ERNST SPAETI); | [X]US4020946 (GARDNER MARSHALL J, et al); | [Y]US3677203 (BARRINEAU WADE H); | [X]US2927699 (LORA MCGRAW); | [X]US2954129 (GORDON MURRAY A); | [X]CH399689 (KNOEPFEL KONRAD [CH]); | [Y]US3612288 (LESLEY JAMES RICHARD); | [Y]US4300693 (SPAMER WILLIAM S) |