EP0092867 - Process for preparing cyclohexanol and cyclohexanone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.08.1993 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STAMICARBON B.V. Mijnweg 1 NL-6167 AC Geleen / NL | [1983/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Housmans, Johannes Gerardus H. M. St. Joosterweg 22 NL-6051 HE Maasbracht / NL | 02 /
Van Nispen, Simon Petrus Joahnnes M. Erenfriedstrasse 8 NL-6191 SJ Beek / NL | 03 /
Plantema, Otto Gerrit Braakpeel 1 NL-6034 RP Nederweert Eind / NL | [1983/44] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1990/11] |
Former [1986/41] | Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis Roeland, et al OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [1984/33] | Hatzmann, Marinus Jan OCTROOIBUREAU DSM P.O.Box 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [1983/44] | Pinckaers, August René OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 83200544.1 | 15.04.1983 | [1983/44] | Priority number, date | NL19820001695 | 23.04.1982 Original published format: NL 8201695 | [1983/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0092867 | Date: | 02.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0092867 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07C49/403, C07C35/08, C07C45/33, C07C45/53, C07C29/50, C07C29/132 | [1983/44] | CPC: |
C07C45/33 (EP);
C07C35/08 (KR);
C07C29/132 (EP);
C07C29/50 (EP);
C07C45/53 (EP);
C07C2601/14 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/132, C07C35/08 (EP);
C07C29/50, C07C35/08 (EP);
C07C45/33, C07C49/403 (EP);
C07C45/53, C07C49/403 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Cyclohexanol und Cyclohexanon | [1983/44] | English: | Process for preparing cyclohexanol and cyclohexanone | [1983/44] | French: | Procédé de préparation de cyclohexanol et de cyclohexanone | [1983/44] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/27] | 28.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.1987
24.04.1987
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | 02
14.04.1987
13.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.1987
24.04.1987
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
02
14.04.1987
13.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
Former [1987/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.1987
24.04.1987
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | 14.07.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.11.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.12.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 01.02.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 18.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 06.02.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 30.03.1993 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1993/38] | Appeal following opposition | 22.03.1991 | Appeal received No. T0247/91 | 31.05.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.03.1993 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 30.03.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.04.1993 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1994/04] | CH | 16.07.1986 | |
LI | 16.07.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2140088 (BASF AG); | [XD]US4238415 (BRYAN WILLIAM O [US]); | [X]FR2313336 (STAMICARBON [NL]) |