EP0094718 - Reactor for the preparation of chlorine dioxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG Postfach 10 15 01 60015 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/47] | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG Postfach 10 15 01, Reuterweg 14 D-60015 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lohrberg, Karl, Dipl.-Ing. Breslauer Strasse 1 D-6056 Heusenstamm / DE | 02 /
Andres, Peter Waldhofstrasse 49 D-6050 Offenbach am Main / DE | [1983/47] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Ernst (DE) Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/47] | Fischer, Ernst, Dr. Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 83200664.7 | 09.05.1983 | [1983/47] | Priority number, date | DE19823218475 | 15.05.1982 Original published format: DE 3218475 | [1983/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0094718 | Date: | 23.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C01B11/02, B01J14/00, B01J19/24 | [1983/47] | CPC: |
C01B11/025 (EP);
B01D3/24 (EP);
B01J14/00 (EP);
B01J19/242 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1983/47] | Title | German: | Reaktor für die Herstellung von Chlordioxid | [1983/47] | English: | Reactor for the preparation of chlorine dioxide | [1983/47] | French: | Réacteurs pour la préparation de dioxyde de chlore | [1983/47] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 18.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/30] | 25.07.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4049785 ; | [X]US4049784 ; | [X]US4045542 ; | [A]GB2000048 ; | [A]DE2939047 |