EP0096918 - Method of preparing a radioactive isotope-containing liquid, as well as device for generating said liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.1987 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mallinckrodt Diagnostica (Holland) B.V. Westerduinweg 3 NL-1755 LE Petten / NL | [1983/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Panek, Karel Jan, Dr. c/o OCTROOIBUREAU ZOAN B.V. Apollolaan 151 NL-1077 AR Amsterdam / NL | [1983/52] | Representative(s) | Swaters, Pieter D., et al OCTROOIBUREAU ZOAN B.V. P.O. Box 140 1380 AC Weesp / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/52] | Swaters, Pieter D., et al OCTROOIBUREAU ZOAN B.V. P.O. Box 140 NL-1380 AC Weesp / NL | Application number, filing date | 83200774.4 | 01.06.1983 | [1983/52] | Priority number, date | NL19820002407 | 14.06.1982 Original published format: NL 8202407 | [1983/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0096918 | Date: | 28.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/00 | [1983/52] | CPC: |
G21G4/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Radioisotop enthaltenden Lösung sowie Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung dieser Lösung | [1983/52] | English: | Method of preparing a radioactive isotope-containing liquid, as well as device for generating said liquid | [1983/52] | French: | Méthode pour préparer un liquide contenant un isotope radioactif et dispositif pour produire ce liquide | [1983/52] | File destroyed: | 03.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 30.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/34] | 29.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/33] | 19.02.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2110108 (SMITH EDWARD, et al); | [AD]GB2047672 (BYK MALLINCKRODT CIL BV); | [A]GB2087633 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK) |