EP0096933 - Process for making a lyophilized product for use in skeletal imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 04.07.1990 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mallinckrodt, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 675 McDonnell Boulevard P.O. Box 5840 St. Louis Missouri 63134 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | For all designated states Mallinckrodt, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 675 McDonnell Boulevard P.O. Box 5840 St. Louis Missouri 63134 / US | ||
Former [1984/41] | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT, INC.(a Missouri corporation) 675 McDonnell Boulevard P.O. Box 5840 St. Louis Missouri 63134 / US | ||
Former [1983/52] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati Ohio 45201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vanduzee, Barry Foster 1191 Highcliff Court Cincinnati Ohio 45224 / US | 02 /
Degenhardt, Charles Raymond 10555 Wellingwood Court Cincinnati Ohio 45240 / US | [1983/52] | Representative(s) | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [1987/06] | BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | ||
Former [1984/41] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London, EC1R 0DS / GB | ||
Former [1983/52] | Suslic, Lydia Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 83200829.6 | 07.06.1983 | [1983/52] | Priority number, date | US19820387136 | 10.06.1982 Original published format: US 387136 | [1983/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0096933 | Date: | 28.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0096933 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0096933 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/02 | [1983/52] | CPC: |
A61K51/1282 (EP,US);
A61K2123/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines lyophilisierten Produktes für die Sichtbarmachung des Skelettes | [1983/52] | English: | Process for making a lyophilized product for use in skeletal imaging | [1983/52] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un produit lyophilisé pour la visualisation du squelette | [1983/52] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/41] | 16.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.07.1987
30.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Compagnie ORIS Industrie 33, rue de la Fédération B.P. 510 F-75752 Paris Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Mongrédien, André, et al, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1987/36] | 12.08.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.12.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.12.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 30.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 14.12.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 08.05.1990 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1990/34] | Appeal following opposition | 15.02.1990 | Appeal received No. T0171/90 | 08.05.1990 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor inadmissible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1991/08] | CH | 08.10.1986 | |
LI | 08.10.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]GB1541070 (PROCTER & GAMBLE); | [X]GB1489330 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) | Examination | EP0096930 | EP0096932 |