EP0097996 - Circuit arrangement for a picture display device for generating a sawtooth line deflection current [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.1986 [1986/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Valkestijn, Leonardus A. A. c/o INT.OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Bergmans, Christianus H. J. c/o INT.OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1984/02] | Representative(s) | Minczeles, Roger, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1984/02] | Application number, filing date | 83200891.6 | 17.06.1983 | [1984/02] | Priority number, date | NL19820002499 | 21.06.1982 Original published format: NL 8202499 | [1984/02] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0097996 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0097996 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/18 | [1984/02] | CPC: |
H04N3/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/02] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung für eine Bildwiedergabeeinrichtung zum Erzeugen eines sägezahnförmigen Zeilenablenkstromes | [1985/42] | English: | Circuit arrangement for a picture display device for generating a sawtooth line deflection current | [1984/02] | French: | Circuit pour un dispositif de reproduction d'images pour la génération d'un courant de déviation ligne à dents de scie | [1985/42] |
Former [1984/02] | Schaltvorrichtung für eine Bildwiedergabeeinrichtung zum Erzeugen eines sägezahnförmigen Zeilenablenkstromes | ||
Former [1984/02] | Circuit de commutation pour un dispositif de reproduction d'images pour la génération d'un courant de déflection ligne à dents de scie | Examination procedure | 03.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/17] | 23.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0033678 (VIDEOCOLOR SA [FR]) |