EP0100112 - Liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.03.1986 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBC Aktiengesellschaft Brown, Boveri & Cie. Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | [1984/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schad, Hanspeter, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Boldistrasse 6 CH-5415 Rieden / CH | [1984/06] | Application number, filing date | 83200978.1 | 01.07.1983 | [1984/06] | Priority number, date | CH19820004256 | 13.07.1982 Original published format: CH 425682 | [1984/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0100112 | Date: | 08.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/133, G02F1/137 | [1984/06] | CPC: |
G02F1/1347 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1984/06] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeige | [1984/06] | English: | Liquid crystal display device | [1984/06] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide | [1984/06] | File destroyed: | 08.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 28.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/32] | 22.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1986/18] | 01.12.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1986/18] | 03.03.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3873186 ; | [A]DE3110382 ; | [A]FR2444957 ; | [A]GB2008304 ; | [A]US3967881 | [A] - 1982 SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPAERS, Mai 1982, Seiten 176-177, Coral Gables, USA |