EP0102111 - Telephone circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.1991 [1991/44] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | For:DE
FR
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burgin, Kenneth Neville C/O TMC LIMITED Swindon Road Malmesbury Wiltshire / GB | [1984/10] | Representative(s) | Andrews, Arthur Stanley, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | Andrews, Arthur Stanley, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 83201133.2 | 01.08.1983 | [1984/10] | Priority number, date | GB19820024347 | 25.08.1982 Original published format: GB 8224347 | [1984/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0102111 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0102111 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0102111 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04M19/08 | [1984/10] | CPC: |
H04M19/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1984/10] | Title | German: | Fernsprechschaltung | [1984/10] | English: | Telephone circuit | [1984/10] | French: | Circuit pour téléphone | [1984/10] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/49] | 06.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2927474 (SIEMENS AG); | [X]EP0023682 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |