EP0100579 - Flanged plastic lined pipe and method for the preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/07] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prueter, Elton Delmont 1400 Riser Saginaw Michigan 48603 / US | [1984/07] | Representative(s) | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/07] | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, Ir., et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 NL-2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 83201144.9 | 01.08.1983 | [1984/07] | Priority number, date | US19820404026 | 02.08.1982 Original published format: US 404026 | [1984/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0100579 | Date: | 15.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F16L58/10, F16L23/00 | [1984/07] | CPC: |
F16L23/125 (EP);
F16L9/14 (KR);
F16L58/187 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1984/07] | Title | German: | Kunstharzbeschichtetes Flanschrohr und Methode zu deren Herstellung | [1984/07] | English: | Flanged plastic lined pipe and method for the preparation thereof | [1984/07] | French: | Tuyau à bride revêtu de matière plastique et sa méthode de préparation | [1984/07] | File destroyed: | 08.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 13.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/43] | 10.04.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1986/37] | 03.06.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.09.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3335758 [ ] (BERTOLET JR ELMER C) |