EP0107218 - Process for the manufacture of endless metal bands [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 05.06.1991 [1991/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van Doorne's Transmissie B.V. Dr. Hub van Doorneweg 120 Postbus 500 5026 RA Tilburg / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states Van Doorne's Transmissie B.V. Dr. Hub van Doorneweg 120 Postbus 500 NL-5026 RA Tilburg / NL | ||
Former [1984/18] | For all designated states Van Doorne's Transmissie B.V. Dr. Hub van Doorneweg 120 Postbus 500 NL-5026 RA Tilburg / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koppelaars, Willem Brede Steeg 35 NL-5062 KG Oisterwijk / NL | [1984/18] | Representative(s) | Timmermans, Anthonius C.Th. Octrooibureau Zuid, Bureau voor Merken en Modellen B.V., Postbus 4582 5601 EN Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Timmermans, Anthonius C.Th., Ir. European Patent Attorneys Octrooibureau Zuid P.O. Box 2287 NL-5600 CG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1984/18] | Louet Feisser, Arnold Abraham Alfred Postbus 500 NL-5000 AM Tilburg / NL | Application number, filing date | 83201337.9 | 19.09.1983 | [1984/18] | Priority number, date | NL19820003686 | 23.09.1982 Original published format: NL 8203686 | [1984/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0107218 | Date: | 02.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0107218 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B21D53/14 | [1984/18] | CPC: |
B21D53/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von endlosen Metallbändern | [1984/18] | English: | Process for the manufacture of endless metal bands | [1984/18] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de courroies sans fin en métal | [1984/18] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1984 | Examination requested [1984/52] | 13.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/not-exclusive | For: | AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE | Licencee: | Volvo Car B.V. Steenovenweg 1 Helmond / NL | Date: | 06.02.1987 |
Former [1987/13] | ID: | 01 00/not-exclusive | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | Volvo Car B.V. Steenovenweg 1 Helmond / NL | ||
Date: | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.04.1990 | BE | 11.04.1990 | CH | 11.04.1990 | LI | 11.04.1990 | SE | 11.04.1990 | [1991/23] |
Former [1991/17] | AT | 11.04.1990 | |
CH | 11.04.1990 | ||
LI | 11.04.1990 | ||
SE | 11.04.1990 | ||
Former [1990/50] | CH | 11.04.1990 | |
LI | 11.04.1990 | ||
SE | 11.04.1990 | ||
Former [1990/46] | CH | 11.04.1990 | |
LI | 11.04.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR539968 ; | [A]US3126626 ; | [Y]FR2082688 (POLAKOWSKI NATALIS); | [YD]US3922771 (BEUSINK BERNARD JOSEP, et al); | [A]DE2725778 (KLOFTEN & KLOFTEN A S OSLO) |