EP0107222 - Prosthesis for an artificial hybrid organ [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.1984 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1984 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.10.1984 [1984/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buchs, Jean-Bernard, Professeur 17, Route de Florissant CH-1206 Genève / CH | For all designated states Jeanjacquot, Alain Châlet de la Pierre au Roy F-74560 Monnetier-Mornex / FR | For all designated states Meyer, Pierre 3, rue des Granges CH-1204 Genève / CH | For all designated states Von Segesser, Ludwig K. Avenue du Tribunal Fédéral, 21 1005 Lausanne / CH | For all designated states Hahn, Charles, Professeur Centre de Chirurgie Cardiaque CH-1261 Arzier (VD) / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/18] | For all designated states Buchs, Jean-Bernard, Professeur 17, Route de Florissant CH-1206 Genève / CH | ||
For all designated states Jeanjacquot, Alain Châlet de la Pierre au Roy F-74560 Monnetier-Mornex / FR | |||
For all designated states Meyer, Pierre 3, rue des Granges CH-1204 Genève / CH | |||
For all designated states Von Segesser, Ludwig 31, rue Dancet CH-1205 Genève / CH | |||
For all designated states Hahn, Charles, Professeur Centre de Chirurgie Cardiaque CH-1261 Arzier (VD) / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/18] | Representative(s) | Silhol, Christian Maurice Alfred, et al c/o BUGNION S.A. Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 10, route de Florissant Case Postale 375 CH-1211 Genève 12 - Champel / CH | [1984/18] | Application number, filing date | 83201355.1 | 22.09.1983 | [1984/18] | Priority number, date | CH19820005637 | 24.09.1982 Original published format: CH 563782 | [1984/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0107222 | Date: | 02.05.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61F1/00 | [1984/18] | CPC: |
A61M1/3687 (EP,US);
A61F2/022 (EP);
A61M1/3689 (EP,US);
B01D69/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/18] | Title | German: | Prothese für künstliches hybrides Organ | [1984/18] | English: | Prosthesis for an artificial hybrid organ | [1984/18] | French: | Prothèse pour organe artificiel hybride | [1984/18] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 02.08.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3093831 (WILHELM JORDAN GERHARD PAUL); | [A]US3827565 (MATSUMURA K); | [A]FR2270895 (COMMUNITY BLOOD COUNCIL GREATE [US]); | [Y]GB1479002 (SPIELBERG T); | [Y]DE2811372 (CONNAUGHT LAB); | [A]US4242460 (CHICK WILLIAM L [US], et al) |