EP0105557 - Binding machines for packages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITIPACK s.r.l. Via Capovilla, 73 I-36030 Villaverla (Vicenza) / IT | [1984/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benetti, Bruno Via Capovilla, 73 I-36030 Villaverla (Vincenza) / IT | [1984/16] | Representative(s) | Bettello, Luigi Studio Tecnico Ingg. Luigi e Pietro Bettello Via Col d'Echele, 25 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/16] | Bettello, Luigi, Dott. Ing. Studio Tecnico Ingg. Luigi e Pietro Bettello Via Col d'Echele, 25 I-36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 83201376.7 | 27.09.1983 | [1984/16] | Priority number, date | IT19820085619 | 06.10.1982 Original published format: IT 8561982 | [1984/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0105557 | Date: | 18.04.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0105557 | Date: | 12.06.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B65B13/06 | [1984/16] | CPC: |
B65B13/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/16] | Title | German: | Bindemaschinen für Verpackungen | [1984/16] | English: | Binding machines for packages | [1984/16] | French: | Perfectionnements aux machines pour le cerclage des colis | [1984/16] | File destroyed: | 08.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 13.02.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/34] | 17.03.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.12.1985 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2403261 (STANKOVICC GANSEN MARYAN) |