EP0084403 - Silver halide emulsion containing a purified cysteine-glutaraldehyde polymer fraction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1987 [1987/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beutel, Jacob 127 Ridgeland Road Wilmington Delaware 19803 / US | 02 /
Le Strange, Raymond Joseph 1720 Hummingbird Lane Hendersonville North Carolina 28739 / US | [1983/30] | Representative(s) | Watkins, Arnold Jack, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/30] | Watkins, Arnold Jack, et al European Patent Attorney Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83300013.6 | 04.01.1983 | [1983/30] | Priority number, date | US19820336766 | 04.01.1982 Original published format: US 336766 | [1983/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0084403 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0084403 | Date: | 14.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084403 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08G12/06, G03C1/06, G03C1/04, G03C1/02 | [1983/30] | CPC: |
G03C1/04 (EP,US);
C08G12/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1983/30] | Title | German: | Silberhalogenidemulsion die eine Fraktion eines gereinigten Cysteine-Glutaraldehyd-Polymers enthält | [1983/30] | English: | Silver halide emulsion containing a purified cysteine-glutaraldehyde polymer fraction | [1983/30] | French: | Emulsion à l'halogénure d'argent comprenant une fraction d'un polymère purifié à base de cystéine-aldéhyde glutarique | [1983/30] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/18] | 21.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US3869289 (AMERING CHARLES F); | [XD]US3708302 (PLAKUNOV J, et al) |