EP0084417 - Production of aromatic carbonyl compounds including novel acetophenones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1987 [1987/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/30] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harada, Haruhisa No. 23-5, Aobadai 7-chome Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | 02 /
Maki, Hiroshi No. 1353-4, Shiizu Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | [1983/30] | Representative(s) | Moore, Anthony John, et al Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [1983/30] | Application number, filing date | 83300093.8 | 07.01.1983 | [1983/30] | Priority number, date | JP19820001573 | 07.01.1982 Original published format: JP 157382 | JP19820140658 | 12.08.1982 Original published format: JP 14065882 | JP19820190567 | 28.10.1982 Original published format: JP 19056782 | [1983/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0084417 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084417 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/53, C07C49/82, C07C49/794, C07C45/66, C07C47/52 | [1983/30] | CPC: |
C07C409/08 (EP,US);
C07C407/00 (EP,US);
C07C45/53 (EP,US);
C07C45/66 (EP,US);
C07C49/794 (EP,US);
C07C49/82 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C407/00, C07C409/08 (US,EP);
C07C45/66, C07C49/794 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/30] | Title | German: | Herstellung von aromatischen Carbonylverbindungen sowie Azetophenonen | [1983/30] | English: | Production of aromatic carbonyl compounds including novel acetophenones | [1983/30] | French: | Préparation de composés aromatiques carbonylés ainsi que des acétophénones | [1983/30] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/47] | 08.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2634294 (MANN BUTLER JOHN); | [X]US2671111 (MANN BUTLER JOHN); | [X]FR1049001 (GENRERAL TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY); | [Y]US2557968 (HULSE GEORGE E, et al); | [Y]DE2631324 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [Y]DE2010534 ; | [Y]US3401193 (FARRISSEY JR WILLIAM J); | [A]FR2231652 (RHONE POULENC SA [FR]); | [A]GB641250 (DISTILLERS CO YEAST LTD, et al) | [A] - TETRAHEDRON, vol. 35, no. 17, 1979, pages 2021 - 2026, Pergamon Press, G.B., Z. CEKOVIC et al.: 'Remote functionalisation by ferrous ion-cupric ion induced decomposition of alkyl hydroperoxides' |