EP0083982 - Wraparound article carrier with adjustable girth [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.1990 [1990/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Mead Corporation Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/29] | For all designated states THE MEAD CORPORATION Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oliff, James R. 6838 Cherry Log Place Austell Georgia 30001 / US | [1983/29] | Representative(s) | Hepworth, John Malcolm Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/29] | Hepworth, John Malcolm Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 83300094.6 | 07.01.1983 | [1983/29] | Priority number, date | US19820337777 | 07.01.1982 Original published format: US 337777 | [1983/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0083982 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0083982 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/00 | [1983/29] | CPC: |
B65D71/16 (EP,US);
B65D71/00 (KR);
B65D2571/00185 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00277 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0029 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00444 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00561 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0066 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00716 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0087 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/29] | Title | German: | Verpackungsumhüllung mit verstellbarem Umfang zum Tragen von Artikeln | [1983/29] | English: | Wraparound article carrier with adjustable girth | [1983/29] | French: | Enveloppe porteuse d'articles, à circonférence réglable | [1983/29] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/14] | 28.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/11] | Request for further processing for: | 25.07.1987 | Request for further processing filed | 23.07.1987 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.08.1987 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1986 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 07.04.1986 | 04   M02   Fee paid on   16.04.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 22.03.1989 | LI | 22.03.1989 | SE | 22.03.1989 | [1990/04] |
Former [1989/36] | SE | 22.03.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3508699 (GRASER EARL J); | [A]FR2377541 (MEAD CORP [US]) | Examination | GB1041305 | GB1106404 | GB1169762 | EP0084933 |