EP0087856 - A process for the removal of H2S from gaseous mixtures using diaminoethers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stogryn, Eugene Leo 3 Sharp Road Edison New Jersey 08817 / US | 02 /
Savage, David William 6 Sunset Drive Summit New Jersey 07901 / US | 03 /
Sartori, Guido 25 West Price Street Linden New Jersey 07036 / US | [1983/36] | Representative(s) | Pitkin, Robert Wilfred, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Apex Tower High Street New Malden Surrey KT3 4DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | Pitkin, Robert Wilfred, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Apex Tower High Street New Malden Surrey KT3 4DJ / GB | ||
Former [1983/36] | Field, Roger Norton (GB) Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square GB-London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 83300186.0 | 14.01.1983 | [1983/36] | Priority number, date | US19820339883 | 18.01.1982 Original published format: US 339883 | US19820339884 | 18.01.1982 Original published format: US 339884 | US19820339890 | 18.01.1982 Original published format: US 339890 | US19820339899 | 18.01.1982 Original published format: US 339899 | US19820339900 | 18.01.1982 Original published format: US 339900 | [1983/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0087856 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087856 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/34, B01D53/14, C07C93/04, C07D295/08 | [1983/36] | CPC: |
C07D295/088 (EP);
B01D53/1468 (EP);
B01D53/1493 (EP);
C07C217/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von H2S aus Gasmischungen unter Verwendung von Diaminoäthern | [1983/36] | English: | A process for the removal of H2S from gaseous mixtures using diaminoethers | [1983/36] | French: | Procédé pour l'élimination de H2S de mélanges gazeux utilisant des étherdiamines | [1983/36] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/47] | 23.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.07.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE960191 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG); | [A]US3400157 (FEDOR POPPELSDORF); | [A]DE2134379 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [A]DE2824908 (BASF AG); | [A]US4217238 (SARTORI GUIDO [US], et al); | [A]US4238206 (HONG CHARLES C [US]) |