EP0084449 - Apparatus for recording and/or reproducing video and audio signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1986 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.1986 [1986/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/30] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maruichi, Takanori c/o Patent Division Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa-6 Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hagita, Shoji c/o Patent Division Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa-6 Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1983/30] | Representative(s) | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/30] | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 83300217.3 | 17.01.1983 | [1983/30] | Priority number, date | JP19820005264 | 16.01.1982 Original published format: JP 526482 | [1983/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0084449 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084449 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/76 | [1983/30] | CPC: |
H04N9/87 (EP,US);
H04N5/93 (EP,US);
H04N9/8355 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL [1983/30] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Aufzeichnung und/oder Wiedergabe von Bild- und Tonsignalen | [1983/30] | English: | Apparatus for recording and/or reproducing video and audio signals | [1983/30] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et/ou de reproduction de signaux vidéo et de signaux de son | [1983/30] | Examination procedure | 04.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/12] | 17.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2141815 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH); | US4007484 [ ] (AMARI SHINJI); | US4007482 [ ] (AMARI SHINJI); | GB1548933 [ ] (SONY CORP); | US4322746 [ ] (OGUINO MASANORI); | EP0061050 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | EP0066067 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) |