EP0085503 - Electrostatographic development process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.1988 [1988/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/32] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kopko, John J. 1381 Willowdale Drive Macedon New York 14502 / US | [1983/32] | Representative(s) | Weatherald, Keith Baynes, et al Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department 364 Euston Road London NW1 3BL / GB | [1983/52] |
Former [1983/32] | Weatherald, Keith Baynes Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 83300244.7 | 18.01.1983 | [1983/32] | Priority number, date | US19820340570 | 18.01.1982 Original published format: US 340570 | [1983/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0085503 | Date: | 10.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0085503 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G03G13/09 | [1983/32] | CPC: |
G03G13/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1983/32] | Title | German: | Elektrostatographisches Entwicklungsverfahren | [1983/32] | English: | Electrostatographic development process | [1983/32] | French: | Procédé de développement électrostatographique | [1983/32] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/13] | 26.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2313297 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG); | [AD]US4013041 (ARMSTRONG TIMOTHY G, et al); | [Y]US4076857 (KASPER GEORGE PHILIP, et al); | [A]EP0032424 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0041399 (XEROX CORP [US]) |