EP0088491 - Apparatus and process for thermoforming thermoplastic sheet materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1987 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1987 [1987/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.R. GRACE AUSTRALIA LIMITED 1126-1134 Sydney Road Fawkner Victoria 3060 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1983/37] | For all designated states W.R. GRACE AUSTRALIA LIMITED 1126-1134 Sydney Road Fawkner Victoria 3060 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bullock, Lance William Lot 1, Jumping Creek Road Wonga Park Victoria / AU | 02 /
Vlahek, Josip 54 Gordon Street Tullamarine Victoria / AU | 03 /
Kovacs, Ferenc 4 Birch Avenue Tullamarine Victoria / AU | [1983/37] | Representative(s) | Barlow, Roy James, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/37] | Barlow, Roy James, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 83300272.8 | 19.01.1983 | [1983/37] | Priority number, date | AU19820002922 | 02.03.1982 Original published format: AU 292282 | [1983/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0088491 | Date: | 14.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0088491 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/08, B29C51/42 | [1986/13] | CPC: |
B29C51/426 (EP,US);
B29C51/04 (EP,US);
B29C51/26 (EP,US);
B29C51/428 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/37] | B29C17/03 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/37] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Thermoformung von blattförmigem thermoplastischen Material | [1983/37] | English: | Apparatus and process for thermoforming thermoplastic sheet materials | [1983/37] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de thermoformage d'une feuille de matière thermoplastique | [1983/37] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/16] | 14.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2990581 [ ] (ROWE JR ARTHUR GEORGE); | US3901640 [ ] (TIGNER REUBEN A, et al); | US4039271 [ ] (HUDSON JIMMIE E, et al) |