EP0085562 - Corrosion inhibitor comprising Sb and Mo salts and process for inhibiting corrosion using the inhibitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.1987 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.05.1987 [1987/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/32] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foroulis, Zisis Andrew 33 Franklin Road Mendham New Jersey 07945 / US | 02 /
Feather, James Edward 2350 Rt. 10 No. A-20 Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | 03 /
Say, Geoffrey Rhys 3020 Tall Timbers Road Baton Rouge Louisiana 70815 / US | 04 /
Hays, James Richard 9878 Chateau Drive Baton Rouge Louisiana 70815 / US | 05 /
Chung, Jihchin 2129 Balsawood Drive Baton Rouge Louisiana 70816 / US | [1983/32] | Representative(s) | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 12 Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/32] | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | Application number, filing date | 83300476.5 | 31.01.1983 | [1983/32] | Priority number, date | US19820344986 | 02.02.1982 Original published format: US 344986 | US19820344987 | 02.02.1982 Original published format: US 344987 | US19820345001 | 02.02.1982 Original published format: US 345001 | [1983/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0085562 | Date: | 10.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0085562 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C23F11/18, B01D53/34 | [1983/32] | CPC: |
B01D53/1493 (EP);
C23F11/06 (EP);
C23F11/187 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/32] | Title | German: | Sb-und Mo-Salze enthaltender Korrosionsinhibitor und Verfahren zur Inhibierung von Korrosion unter Verwendung des Inhibitors | [1983/32] | English: | Corrosion inhibitor comprising Sb and Mo salts and process for inhibiting corrosion using the inhibitor | [1983/32] | French: | Inhibiteur de corrosion à base de sels de Sb et de Mo et procédé pour l'inhibition de la corrosion par emploi de l'inhibiteur | [1983/32] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/13] | 22.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP56119783 [ ]; | US3311529 [ ] (CHISHOLM STANLEY L); | US3808140 [ ] (MAGO B, et al); | US3951844 [ ] (MAGO BLAKE F); | US4112050 [ ] (SARTORI GUIDO, et al); | EP0034901 [ ] (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications; C field, vol. 5, no. 195, December 11, 1981 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 159 C 83 & JP-A-56-119 783 (sumitomo kinzoku kogyo k.k.), & JP56119783 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0032618 |