EP0086659 - Apparatus for recording and reproducing a digital signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.1988 [1988/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/34] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Nobuhiko c/o Patent Division Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa-6 Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Masato c/o Patent Division Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa-6 Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1983/34] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Christopher Hugo, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1983/34] | Application number, filing date | 83300742.0 | 15.02.1983 | [1983/34] | Priority number, date | JP19820022288 | 15.02.1982 Original published format: JP 2228882 | [1983/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0086659 | Date: | 24.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0086659 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0086659 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/09, G11B27/08, G11B15/52 | [1984/27] | CPC: |
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B15/52 (EP,US);
G11B19/28 (EP,US);
G11B20/1204 (EP,US);
G11B20/18 (EP,US);
G11B27/032 (EP,US);
G11B27/10 (EP,US);
G11B20/1202 (EP,US);
G11B2220/90 (EP,US);
G11B2220/913 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1983/34] | G11B5/09 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1983/34] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungs- und Wiedergabegerät für digitale Signale | [1983/34] | English: | Apparatus for recording and reproducing a digital signal | [1983/34] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction d'un signal numérique | [1983/34] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 08.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE890108 (SONY CORP); | [A]BE889911 (SONY CORP); | [A]US4222079 (ONISHI KEN, et al); | [A]GB2080997 (SONY CORP); | [A]US4145683 (BROOKHART MARSHALL R); | [A]FR2456987 (SONY CORP [JP]) |