EP0087277 - Polyamides and anti-fouling compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.10.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Britannic House Moor Lane London EC2Y 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/35] | For all designated states The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Britannic House Moor Lane London EC2Y 9BU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pipe, Colin Antony The British Petroleum C. p.l.c. Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | [1983/35] | Representative(s) | Ryan, Edward Terrence, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/35] | Ryan, Edward Terrence, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 83300826.1 | 18.02.1983 | [1983/35] | Priority number, date | GB19820004810 | 18.02.1982 Original published format: GB 8204810 | [1983/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0087277 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0087277 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07C103/44, C07C103/64, C07C103/87, C10G7/10, C10G9/16, C23F14/02 | [1983/35] | CPC: |
C10G9/16 (EP);
C23F14/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/35] | Title | German: | Polyamide und diese enthaltende fäulnisverhindernde Zusammensetzungen | [1983/35] | English: | Polyamides and anti-fouling compositions containing them | [1983/35] | French: | Polyamides et compositions anti-destructives les contenant | [1983/35] | File destroyed: | 03.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 26.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/36] | 15.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1988/50] | 06.04.1988 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1988/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1987 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1587949 ; | [X]FR1433354 ; | [X]GB782879 ; | [X]GB1198734 ; | [X]US3458453 ; | [X]EP0008591 |