EP0087941 - Ligating clip with flanged base [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.04.1989 [1989/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | For all designated states ETHICON INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mericle, Robert William RD 3, Blossom Hill Road Lebanon New Jersey / US | 02 /
Transue, James Anthony 1305 Shetland Drive Union New Jersey / US | [1983/36] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 83300995.4 | 25.02.1983 | [1983/36] | Priority number, date | US19820352834 | 26.02.1982 Original published format: US 352834 | [1983/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0087941 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0087941 | Date: | 15.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087941 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12 | [1983/36] | CPC: |
A61B17/128 (EP,US);
A61B17/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1983/36] | Title | German: | Abbindungsklammer mit einer eine Flansch aufweisenden Basis | [1983/36] | English: | Ligating clip with flanged base | [1983/36] | French: | Pince de ligature avec une base à bride | [1983/36] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/41] | 12.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 30.11.1986 | [1989/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2054027 (ETHICON INC); | [A]US2707783 (SULLIVAN NORMAN M); | [A]US4228895 (LARKIN JOSEPH F); | [A]FR2214455 (AKIYAMA TAICHIRO [JP]); | [AD]US3780416 (RIDER G); | [A]FR680389 ; | [A]US3837555 (GREEN D); | [AD]US3753438 (WOOD E, et al); | [E]EP0087939 (ETHICON INC [US]); | [E]EP0087940 (ETHICON INC [US]) | Examination | EP0087942 |