EP0087960 - Electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/36] | Improvementsin and relating to electric motors | ||
[1988/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TUSCAN ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED North Road Industrial Estate Bridgend Mid Glamorgan Wales CF31 3YF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | For all designated states TUSCAN ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED North Road Industrial Estate Bridgend Mid Glamorgan Wales CF31 3YF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Williams, Norman Ernest The Poplars Cowbridge S. Glamorgan Wales, CF7 7BD / GB | [1983/36] | Representative(s) | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London, WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 83301032.5 | 25.02.1983 | [1983/36] | Priority number, date | GB19820005913 | 01.03.1982 Original published format: GB 8205913 | [1983/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0087960 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0087960 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087960 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/136 | [1983/36] | CPC: |
H02K5/225 (EP);
H02K17/30 (EP);
H02K5/136 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/36] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Motor | [1983/36] | English: | Electric motor | [1988/23] | French: | Moteur électrique | [1983/36] |
Former [1983/36] | Improvementsin and relating to electric motors | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 19.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/48] | 27.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1987 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.1988 | BE | 08.06.1988 | CH | 08.06.1988 | FR | 08.06.1988 | IT | 08.06.1988 | LI | 08.06.1988 | NL | 08.06.1988 | SE | 30.06.1988 | LU | 28.02.1989 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 08.06.1988 | |
BE | 08.06.1988 | ||
CH | 08.06.1988 | ||
IT | 08.06.1988 | ||
LI | 08.06.1988 | ||
NL | 08.06.1988 | ||
SE | 30.06.1988 | ||
LU | 28.02.1989 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 08.06.1988 | |
BE | 08.06.1988 | ||
CH | 08.06.1988 | ||
IT | 08.06.1988 | ||
LI | 08.06.1988 | ||
NL | 08.06.1988 | ||
SE | 30.06.1988 | ||
Former [1989/27] | AT | 08.06.1988 | |
BE | 08.06.1988 | ||
CH | 08.06.1988 | ||
LI | 08.06.1988 | ||
NL | 08.06.1988 | ||
SE | 30.06.1988 | ||
Former [1989/23] | AT | 08.06.1988 | |
BE | 08.06.1988 | ||
NL | 08.06.1988 | ||
SE | 30.06.1988 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 08.06.1988 | |
BE | 08.06.1988 | ||
NL | 08.06.1988 | ||
Former [1989/11] | BE | 08.06.1988 | |
NL | 08.06.1988 | ||
Former [1989/03] | BE | 08.06.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1921607U (HEEMAF S K A MOTORENWERK A G [DE]); | [Y]DE1942598U (HIMMELWERK AG [DE]); | [A]US3335323 (URBAN MOLIN) |