EP0088630 - Variable size ink printing method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIWI CODERS CORPORATION 265 East Messner Drive Wheeling Illinois 60090 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/37] | For all designated states KIWI CODERS CORPORATION 265 East Messner Drive Wheeling Illinois 60090 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siegal, Burton L. 7605 North Tripp Avenue Skokie Illinois 60076 / US | [1983/37] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/37] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 83301261.0 | 08.03.1983 | [1983/37] | Priority number, date | US19820356224 | 08.03.1982 Original published format: US 356224 | [1983/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0088630 | Date: | 14.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0088630 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/04, B65B61/26 | [1983/37] | CPC: |
B41J25/3082 (EP,US);
B41J2/01 (EP);
B41J25/308 (EP);
B41J3/286 (EP);
B41J3/4073 (EP,US);
B65B61/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/37] | Title | German: | Tintendruckverfahren und -anordnung zum Darstellen von Zeichen variabeler Schriftgrösse | [1983/37] | English: | Variable size ink printing method and apparatus | [1983/37] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour l'impression avec de l'encre, de caractères de dimensions variables | [1983/37] | File destroyed: | 03.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 10.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/52] | 30.09.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/14] | 05.11.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1987/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4009332 (VAN HOOK DANNY ALLEN); | [A]US4083053 (OUCHI YOSHIO, et al); | [A]US4168533 (SCHWARTZ LEON J); | [A]US4169684 (BLOM NICO [NL]); | [Y]EP0036296 (PRINTOS BV [NL]); | [A]EP0036295 (PRINTOS BV [NL]); | [Y]EP0038630 (MEAD CORP [US]) |