EP0089204 - Method and apparatus for high efficiency operation of electromechanical energy conversion devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.1986 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.1986 [1986/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GABEL, JONATHAN 5800 Ocean View Avenue Oakland California 94618 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/38] | For all designated states GABEL, JONATHAN 5800 Ocean View Avenue Oakland California 94618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/38] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/38] | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83301366.7 | 11.03.1983 | [1983/38] | Priority number, date | US19820358697 | 16.03.1982 Original published format: US 358697 | [1983/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0089204 | Date: | 21.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0089204 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H02P5/06, H02P7/28, H02P7/62 | [1983/38] | CPC: |
H02P7/298 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für einen Hocheffizientbetrieb von elektromechanischen Energieumformungsgeräten | [1983/38] | English: | Method and apparatus for high efficiency operation of electromechanical energy conversion devices | [1983/38] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'opération à haut rendement des appareils électromécaniques de conversion d'énergie | [1983/38] | File destroyed: | 09.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 24.09.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/12] | 23.10.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.07.1985 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3950684 (PETERSON ROBERT S); | [AD]US4037144 (OHMAE TSUTOMU, et al); | [A]GB2040085 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]US4247807 (WILSON JAMES W A); | [A]GB2056709 (CABLEFORM LTD) |