EP0090576 - A pulse encoder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.1987 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | ||
Former [1983/40] | For all designated states Fanuc Ltd 5-1, Asahigaoka, 3-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amemiya, Yoichi 1019-357 Nishiterakata-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takekoshi, Yoshitaka Gurin Hiru Terada 130-104 432, Terada-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | [2007/32] |
Former [1983/46] | 01 /
Amemiya, Yoichi 1019-357 Nishiterakata-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Takekoshi, Yoshitaka Gurin Hiru Terada 130-104 432, Terada-cho Asahigaoka Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1983/40] | 01 /
Amemiya, Yoichi 1019-357 Nishiterakata-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Takekoshi, Yoshitaka Akutagawa Kopo 201, 3-3-20 Asahigaoka Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [1983/40] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK Suite 301 Sunlight House Quay Street Manchester M3 3JY / GB | Application number, filing date | 83301578.7 | 22.03.1983 | [1983/40] | Priority number, date | JP19820050060 | 30.03.1982 Original published format: JP 5006082 | [1983/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0090576 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0090576 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H03K13/18, G01D5/36, G01P3/48 | [1985/34] | CPC: |
G01P3/486 (EP);
H03M1/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1983/40] | H03K13/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/40] | Title | German: | Pulskodierer | [1983/40] | English: | A pulse encoder | [1983/40] | French: | Codeur d'impulsions | [1983/40] | File destroyed: | 03.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 14.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/40] | 17.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/01] | 29.07.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP57022511 ; | [Y]US4218615 ; | [Y]DE2948182 | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 84 (P-117)[962], 22nd May 1982; & JP-A-57 022 511 (FUJITSU FANUC K.K.) 05-02-1982, & JP57022511 A 00000000 |