EP0090672 - Improvements in or relating to welding and laying pipelines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.1989 [1989/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.I.S. Limited Ackhurst Road Chorley Lancashire PR7 1NH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | For all designated states N.I.S. Limited Ackhurst Road Chorley Lancashire PR7 1NH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foulkes, Thomas Lawrence Jesmond View Bere Court Road Pangbourne Berkshire RG8 8JU / GB | [1983/40] | Representative(s) | Hayward, Denis Edward Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | Hayward, Denis Edward Peter, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 83301872.4 | 31.03.1983 | [1983/40] | Priority number, date | GB19820009496 | 31.03.1982 Original published format: GB 8209496 | [1983/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0090672 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0090672 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F16L1/04, B23K26/00 | [1983/40] | CPC: |
B63B35/03 (EP,US);
B23K26/103 (EP,US);
B23K26/282 (EP,US);
B23K37/0533 (EP,US);
B23K9/0286 (EP,US);
F16L1/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/40] | Title | German: | Zusammenschweissen und Verlegen von Pipe-lines | [1983/40] | English: | Improvements in or relating to welding and laying pipelines | [1983/40] | French: | Soudure et pose des pipe-lines | [1983/40] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/23] | 12.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP87113769.1 / EP0262545 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/43] | Request for further processing for: | 31.07.1986 | Request for further processing filed | 31.07.1986 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1987 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2456141 [ ]; | FR2458020 [ ] (GAZ DE FRANCE); | GB2095787 [ ] (BLOHM VOSS AG) |