EP0091774 - Numerical control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1989 [1989/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | ||
Former [1983/42] | For all designated states Fanuc Ltd 5-1, Asahigaoka, 3-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nozawa, Ryoichiro 12-1-2105, Sarugaku-cho Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kawamura, Hideaki 1375-5, Narahara-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Miyata, Mitsuto 1768-149, Yugi Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | [1983/42] | Representative(s) | Bedggood, Guy Stuart, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/42] | Bedggood, Guy Stuart, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 83301918.5 | 06.04.1983 | [1983/42] | Priority number, date | JP19820057714 | 07.04.1982 Original published format: JP 5771482 | [1983/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0091774 | Date: | 19.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0091774 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/405 | [1983/42] | CPC: |
G05B19/408 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35245 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35252 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/42] | Title | German: | Numerische Steuerung | [1983/42] | English: | Numerical control | [1983/42] | French: | Commande numérique | [1983/42] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/24] | 08.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3616993 (MCGUIRE RICHARD, et al); | [Y]EP0041336 (FANUC LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0046032 (FANUC LTD [JP]) |