EP0091797 - Shadow-free lamp assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.1988 [1988/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koito-Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 100 Maeda-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | For all designated states Sankin Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 3-10, 3-chome Minami-senba Minami-ku Osaka-shi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/42] | For all designated states Koito-Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 100 Maeda-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Sankin Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 3-10, 3-chome Minami-senba Minami-ku Osaka-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamauchi, Osamu c/o Koito Kogyo K. K. 100 Maeda-cho Totsuka-ku Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Hoashi, Kazuomi 979-61, Kasori-cho Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | [1983/42] | Representative(s) | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/42] | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 83301979.7 | 08.04.1983 | [1983/42] | Priority number, date | JP19820053090U | 14.04.1982 Original published format: JP 5309082 U | [1983/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0091797 | Date: | 19.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0091797 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/09, F21M1/00 | [1983/42] | CPC: |
F21V7/09 (EP,US);
F21S8/08 (EP,US);
F21V7/048 (EP,US);
F21V21/04 (EP,US);
F21W2131/202 (EP,US);
Y10S362/804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/42] | Title | German: | Schattenfreie Beleuchtungsvorrichtung | [1983/42] | English: | Shadow-free lamp assembly | [1983/42] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage sans ombres portées | [1983/42] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/09] | 16.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2255819 (ETTORE SALANI); | [X]GB234905 (GILBERT ALLOM); | [X]US1585852 (CLYDE GOWDY ROBERT); | [A]US3001061 (BUELL MOORE) | Examination | EP0084934 |