EP0091835 - Electrical junction system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1989 [1989/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie-ken / JP | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | |||
Former [1983/42] | For all designated states TOKAI ELECTRIC WIRE COMPANY LIMITED 1-14 Nishisuehirocho Yokkaichi-shi Mie-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Nori 127 Higashihinocho Yokkaichi-shi / JP | 02 /
Moriai, Yasuharu 11-41 Higashiasahigaoka-6-chome Suzuka-shi / JP | 03 /
Sakatani, Atushi 35-5 Hikaricho Matsuzaka-shi / JP | 04 /
Yoshida, Noriyuki 14-2 Hirata-1-chome Suzuka-shi / JP | [1983/42] | Representative(s) | Topps, Ronald, et al D. YOUNG & CO 10 Staple Inn London WC1V 7RD / GB | [1983/42] | Application number, filing date | 83302124.9 | 14.04.1983 | [1983/42] | Priority number, date | JP19820063007 | 15.04.1982 Original published format: JP 6300782 | JP19830022624 | 14.02.1983 Original published format: JP 2262483 | JP19830022625 | 14.02.1983 Original published format: JP 2262583 | JP19830022627 | 14.02.1983 Original published format: JP 2262783 | JP19830051056 | 25.03.1983 Original published format: JP 5105683 | [1983/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0091835 | Date: | 19.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0091835 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0091835 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/02, H01R23/68 | [1983/42] | CPC: |
H05K7/026 (EP,US);
H05K3/4084 (EP,US);
H05K5/03 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0397 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10272 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10386 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/42] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Verbindungssystem | [1983/42] | English: | Electrical junction system | [1983/42] | French: | Système de connexion électrique | [1983/42] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/38] | 17.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP87200867.7 / EP0259897 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH526900 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]DE2454508 (APPLIC ELETTRO TELEFONICHE S P); | [A]DE2641258 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]GB1553921 (AMP INC); | [A]FR2427715 (AMP INC [US], et al); | [A]GB1601461 (AMP INC) |