EP0093543 - Aromatics production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1987 [1987/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Britannic House Moor Lane London EC2Y 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/45] | For all designated states The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Britannic House Moor Lane London EC2Y 9BU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Young, Dennis The British Petroleum Co. p.l.c. Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | [1983/45] | Representative(s) | Fawcett, Richard Fennelly, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/24] | Fawcett, Richard Fennelly, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | ||
Former [1983/45] | Harry, John c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 83302260.1 | 21.04.1983 | [1983/45] | Priority number, date | GB19820012526 | 29.04.1982 Original published format: GB 8212526 | [1983/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0093543 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0093543 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07C15/00, C07C2/00 | [1983/45] | CPC: |
C07C2/00 (EP,US);
C07C2523/08 (EP,US);
C07C2523/40 (EP,US);
C07C2523/74 (EP,US);
C07C2529/06 (EP,US);
C07C2529/064 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C2/00, C07C15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von aromatischen Kohlenwasserstoffen | [1983/45] | English: | Aromatics production | [1983/45] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'hydrocarbures aromatiques | [1983/45] | Examination procedure | 03.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/24] | 14.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]SU950707 ; | [A]EP0050021 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]); | [AP]US4347395 (CHU YUNG F, et al) | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTACTS, vol. 98, no. 5, January 1983, page 629, no. 34359n, Columbus, Ohio, USA & SU - A - 950 707 (INSTISTUTE OF CATALYSIS, NOVOSIBIRSK) 15-08-1982, & SU950707 A 00000000 |