EP0102141 - Apparatus for administering a liquid to patients [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.1987 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 14.06.1989 [1989/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEST PHARMARUBBER LIMITED Bucklers Lane St. Austell Cornwall, PL25 3LP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | For all designated states WEST PHARMARUBBER LIMITED Bucklers Lane St. Austell Cornwall, PL25 3LP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stafford, Peter William 'Bosinney' Polgooth St. Austell Cornwall / GB | [1984/10] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Joseph Martin, et al WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | [1984/10] | Application number, filing date | 83302719.6 | 13.05.1983 | [1984/10] | Priority number, date | GB19820015439 | 26.05.1982 Original published format: GB 8215439 | GB19830003270 | 07.02.1983 Original published format: GB 8303270 | [1984/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0102141 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0102141 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/16, A61M5/14 | [1984/10] | CPC: |
A61M5/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1984/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verabreichung von Flüssigkeit an Patienten | [1984/10] | English: | Apparatus for administering a liquid to patients | [1984/10] | French: | Dispositif pour administrer un liquide aux patients | [1984/10] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/20] | 14.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.05.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.06.1986 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 14.05.1987 | CH | 31.05.1987 | LI | 31.05.1987 | [1989/24] |
Former [1989/18] | SE | 14.05.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | US2784733 [ ]; | US4078563 [ ]; | US4175558 [ ]; | DE2264148 [ ]; | US2844147 [ ] |