EP0095889 - Solid cosmetic compositions and methods of preparing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.1985 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAX FACTOR & CO 1655 North McCadden Place Holywood California 90028 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/49] | For all designated states MAX FACTOR & CO 1655 North McCadden Place Holywood California 90028 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lanzet, Monroe 4688 Alonzo Avenue Encino California 91316 / US | 02 /
Lambrechts, John 1825 North Vista Street Hollywood California 90046 / US | [1983/49] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [1983/49] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 83303013.3 | 25.05.1983 | [1983/49] | Priority number, date | US19820383204 | 28.05.1982 Original published format: US 383204 | [1983/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0095889 | Date: | 07.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0095889 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/035, A61K7/00, A61K7/46 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
A61Q1/12 (EP);
A61K8/23 (EP);
A61Q1/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1983/49] | A61K7/035 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/49] | Title | German: | Feste kosmetische Präparate und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1983/49] | English: | Solid cosmetic compositions and methods of preparing them | [1983/49] | French: | Compositions cosmétiques solides et méthodes de leur préparation | [1983/49] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 21.06.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1985/49] | 21.08.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1968475 [ ] (BECKWITH HARRY H, et al); | US3953378 [ ] (LASSER BRUNO T); | GB1519373 [ ] (SCHWAN STABILO SCHWANHAEUSSER [DE]) |