EP0098698 - Composite low surface energy liner of perfluoropolyether [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.1988 [1988/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/03] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larson, James M., c/o Minnesota Mining & Manuf.Co. 2501 Hudson Road, P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133 / US | 02 /
Noreen, Allen L., c/o Minnesota Mining & Manuf.Co. 2501 Hudson Road, P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133 / US | [1987/38] |
Former [1984/03] | 01 /
Larson, James M. Minnesota Mining and Manufact. C. 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | ||
02 /
Noreen, Allen L. Minnesota Mining and Manufact. C. 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/03] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83303408.5 | 13.06.1983 | [1984/03] | Priority number, date | US19820394534 | 02.07.1982 Original published format: US 394534 | [1984/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0098698 | Date: | 18.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0098698 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0098698 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08L71/00, C08G65/00, C09J7/02, C09D3/48 | [1984/03] | CPC: |
C09J4/00 (EP);
C08G65/007 (EP);
C08G65/329 (EP);
C09D171/02 (EP);
C09J7/401 (EP);
C09J7/403 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C09J4/00, C08F220/22 (EP);
C09J4/00, C08F222/104 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/03] | Title | German: | Verbundmaterialtrennliner mit einer niedrigen Oberflächenenergie auf der Basis von Perfluorpolyäther | [1984/03] | English: | Composite low surface energy liner of perfluoropolyether | [1984/03] | French: | Revêtement composite à faible énergie de surface à base de perfluoropolyéther | [1984/03] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/34] | 28.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0040923 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]US4085137 (ZOLLINGER JOSEPH LAMAR [US], et al); | [A]GB2019254 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) |