EP0108468 - Electrical control module for a current-limiting fuse [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S & C ELECTRIC COMPANY 6601 North Ridge Boulevard Chicago Illinois 60626 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | For all designated states S & C ELECTRIC COMPANY 6601 North Ridge Boulevard Chicago Illinois 60626 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jarosz, John M. 5002 Estes Skokie Illinois 60077 / US | 02 /
Panas, William R. 2528 Allison Court Glenview Illinois 60026 / US | [1984/20] | Representative(s) | Newstead, Michael John, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th floor 300 High Holborn London, WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | Newstead, Michael John, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 83303619.7 | 23.06.1983 | [1984/20] | Priority number, date | US19820439443 | 05.11.1982 Original published format: US 439443 | [1984/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0108468 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0108468 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108468 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/02, H01H9/10, H01H39/00 | [1984/20] | CPC: |
H01H9/106 (EP,US);
H01H39/00 (EP,US);
H01H71/123 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/30] |
Former [1984/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Elektrischer Kontrollmodul für eine Strombegrenzungssicherung | [1984/20] | English: | Electrical control module for a current-limiting fuse | [1984/20] | French: | Module électrique de contrôle pour un fusible de limitation du courant | [1984/20] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1984 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU | 14.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/25] | 09.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.11.1983 | LU   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.02.1990 | IT | 28.02.1990 | NL | 28.02.1990 | SE | 28.02.1990 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 28.02.1990 | |
IT | 28.02.1990 | ||
NL | 28.02.1990 | ||
SE | 28.02.1990 | ||
Former [1990/52] | AT | 28.02.1990 | |
NL | 28.02.1990 | ||
SE | 28.02.1990 | ||
Former [1990/50] | NL | 28.02.1990 | |
SE | 28.02.1990 | ||
Former [1990/44] | NL | 28.02.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1904244 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [AD]US4342978 (MEISTER OTTO) |